NJ A5691 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3714 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3714 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns liability of certain non-profit and governmental employers for unemployment benefits paid during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic state of emergency.
Title
Concerns liability of certain non-profit and governmental employers for unemployment benefits paid during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic state of emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S3714 (2R) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3714 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.143.