NJ A5604 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases tax credit provided for qualified investments under "New Jersey Angel Investor Tax Credit Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases tax credit provided for qualified investments under "New Jersey Angel Investor Tax Credit Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2298 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.145.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted for S2298 w/c
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-2-0)
2019-06-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3677 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback