NJ A5598 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3814 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3814 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCF or court to consider placement of children with relatives or kinship guardians when making placement decision; makes changes to certain standards for initiating petitions to terminate parental rights.
Title
Requires DCF or court to consider placement of children with relatives or kinship guardians when making placement decision; makes changes to certain standards for initiating petitions to terminate parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3814 (1R) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3814 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.154.