NJ A5597 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits school districts to administer student health surveys after prior written notification to parents and legal guardians.
Title
Permits school districts to administer student health surveys after prior written notification to parents and legal guardians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.156. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-15) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (25-15) (Weinberg) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Oroho) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3801 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-28-0) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3801 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5597