NJ A5593 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows Attorney General to appoint officer in charge when superseding certain law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows Attorney General to appoint officer in charge when superseding certain law enforcement agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30AssemblySubstituted by S3943
2023-06-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-06-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3943 (Same As) 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.94.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback