NJ A5589 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2013
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2022.
Title
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3813 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3813 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.204. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3813 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5589 (Carry Over) 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.204.
S3813 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5589 (1R)
S3813 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5589 (1R)