NJ A5584 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2663
Note: Carry Over of previous A4765
Note: Carry Over of previous A4765
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects domestic equity investments of the Division of Investment to certain requirements, imposes requirements related to selection of external managers and protection of public sector jobs.
Title
Subjects domestic equity investments of the Division of Investment to certain requirements, imposes requirements related to selection of external managers and protection of public sector jobs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S857 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2663 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4765 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
S2663 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4765 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5584 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5584_I1.HTM |