NJ A5559 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30AssemblySubstituted by S3796
2023-06-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-06-15AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-06-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3796 (Same As) 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c.119.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback