NJ A5527 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.243.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.243.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain long-term care facilities to submit outbreak response plan to DOH.
Title
Requires certain long-term care facilities to submit outbreak response plan to DOH.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3900 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3900 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.243. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S3900 (1R) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Vitale) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3900 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5527 (2R)