NJ A5520 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases income eligibility limits for PAAD program and Senior Gold Prescription Discount Program by $10,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases income eligibility limits for PAAD program and Senior Gold Prescription Discount Program by $10,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3633 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.131.
2021-06-24SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2021-06-24SenateSubstituted for S3633 (1R)
2021-06-24SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2021-06-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-06-02AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2021-03-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3633 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5520 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback