NJ A551 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A1272
Note: Carry Over of previous S3198

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-02-10 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain consumers up to five business days to cancel home improvement contracts and up to three days to cancel certain consumer goods contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain consumers up to five business days to cancel home improvement contracts and up to three days to cancel certain consumer goods contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-24 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-02-10AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2024-10-24AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2024-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1272 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S3198 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1046 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback