NJ A5509 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for breastfeeding support.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for breastfeeding support.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3805 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.343.
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-1)
2019-12-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted for S3805 (SS/1R)
2019-11-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-14SenateRecommitted to Senate Commerce Committee
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-1-2)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-06-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3805 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5509 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback