NJ A5507 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3319 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3319 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates certain juvenile justice fines, fees, costs, and other monetary penalties.
Title
Eliminates certain juvenile justice fines, fees, costs, and other monetary penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3319 (2R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3319 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.342.