NJ A5484 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A327
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New Jersey Racing Commission to adopt procedures to enforce internal controls; requires annual audit.
Title
Requires New Jersey Racing Commission to adopt procedures to enforce internal controls; requires annual audit.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3817 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3817 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3817 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5484 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3817 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5484 (1R)
S3817 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5484 (1R)