NJ A5463 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1191
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NJT to erect statue in honor of A. Philip Randolph, appropriates $90,000.
Title
Directs NJT to erect statue in honor of A. Philip Randolph, appropriates $90,000.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3342 |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5463 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3342
S3342 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.400.
S3342 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.400.