NJ A5453 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain criminal penalties for possession and transfer of firearms and ammunition to disqualified person.
Title
Establishes certain criminal penalties for possession and transfer of firearms and ammunition to disqualified person.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-10-7) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5453 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3879 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3879 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee