NJ A5447 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S3521 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S3521 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $15 million in federal funds available to EDA and New Jersey Council on the Arts to support arts and culture organizations in need.
Title
Makes $15 million in federal funds available to EDA and New Jersey Council on the Arts to support arts and culture organizations in need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3521 (1R) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3521 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.43.