NJ A5442 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1797
Note: Carry Foward to future S1906
Note: Carry Foward to future S1906
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that member of SPRS may receive accidental disability benefit under certain circumstances.
Title
Clarifies that member of SPRS may receive accidental disability benefit under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] |
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3529 |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3529
A5442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3529
S3529 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A5442 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3529
S3529 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session