NJ A5418 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Teacher Certification Reimbursement Fund in DOE to reimburse certain teachers for costs associated with certification.
Title
Establishes Teacher Certification Reimbursement Fund in DOE to reimburse certain teachers for costs associated with certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-0) |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Motion To Table Aa (41-30-0) (Greenwald) |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Munoz) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3891 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee