NJ A541 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S765 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S765 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits Higher Education Student Assistance Authority from referring defaulted loans under New Jersey College Loans to AssistState Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program for certain actions if authority and borrower have entered into settlement agreement.*
Title
Prohibits Higher Education Student Assistance Authority from referring defaulted loans under New Jersey College Loans to AssistState Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program for certain actions if authority and borrower have entered into settlement agreement.*
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S765 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4176 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S765 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.386.
S765 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.386.