NJ A5405 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $10 million in federal funds to Department of Agriculture to support food bank organizations.
Title
Appropriates $10 million in federal funds to Department of Agriculture to support food bank organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.67. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3527 (1R) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3527 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5405 (1R)