NJ A5378 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A3121
Note: Carry Foward to future S2073

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Education to establish matching grant program for certain school districts and schools using federal funds to increase instructional time and accelerate learning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Commissioner of Education to establish matching grant program for certain school districts and schools using federal funds to increase instructional time and accelerate learning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2023-05-11AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-05-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5378 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
A5378 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
S4027 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback