NJ A5377 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A535
Note: Carry Foward to future S1907
Note: Carry Foward to future S1907
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Food Innovation District Pilot Program."
Title
Establishes "Food Innovation District Pilot Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5377 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5377 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S4113 (Same As) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5377 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S4113 (Same As) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee