NJ A5373 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows county board of elections to determine location of certain ballot drop boxes under certain circumstances.
Title
Allows county board of elections to determine location of certain ballot drop boxes under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3596 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3596 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.44. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-21-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-12) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3596 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-5) (Beach) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-21-0) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3322 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3596 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5373 (2R)
S3596 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5373 (2R)