NJ A5371 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2432 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2432 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits recovery of uncompensated medical expenses in civil action for damages arising from automobile accident.
Title
Permits recovery of uncompensated medical expenses in civil action for damages arising from automobile accident.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2432 (1R) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2432 (Same As) 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.244.