NJ A5367 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3416 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3416 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies same-sex marriage in the statutes.
Title
Codifies same-sex marriage in the statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3416 (1R) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3416 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.343.