NJ A5345 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S1442 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S1442 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public works contractor registration and payroll certification for public works projects to be completed online.
Title
Requires public works contractor registration and payroll certification for public works projects to be completed online.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S1442 (2R) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1442 (Same As) 2023-08-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.138.