NJ A5336 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2408
Note: Carry Foward to future S1060

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public schools to develop policy for emergency administration of nasal seizure rescue medication and use of manual vagus nerve stimulator on students with seizure disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public schools to develop policy for emergency administration of nasal seizure rescue medication and use of manual vagus nerve stimulator on students with seizure disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-28SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2023-12-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2023-12-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-12-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-03-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5336 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5336 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3817 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback