NJ A533 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A448

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association to require criminal history records check for person to serve as official at athletic events sanctioned by association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association to require criminal history records check for person to serve as official at athletic events sanctioned by association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A448 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S659 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback