NJ A5328 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Substituted by S3732 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Substituted by S3732 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional State school aid to certain school districts; appropriates $103,023,579.
Title
Provides additional State school aid to certain school districts; appropriates $103,023,579.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S3732 (1R) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3732 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.32.