NJ A5264 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Substituted by S3558 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits receipt of retirement annuities by certain members of JRS who filed for deferred retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits receipt of retirement annuities by certain members of JRS who filed for deferred retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30AssemblySubstituted by S3558 (1R)
2023-03-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-03-23AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-02-28AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3558 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.31.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback