NJ A5219 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A186
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3081 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3081 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals law concerning excess rates and charges for title insurance; makes agreement to use services of title or settlement service company subject to attorney review.
Title
Repeals law concerning excess rates and charges for title insurance; makes agreement to use services of title or settlement service company subject to attorney review.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3081 (1R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5219 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3081 (1R)
S3081 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.397.
S3081 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.397.