NJ A5203 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A184
Note: Carry Foward to future S1858
Note: Carry Over of previous S2196
Note: Carry Over of previous A1713

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Sunday firearm and bow hunting for deer on certain lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Sunday firearm and bow hunting for deer on certain lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5203 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A5203 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S2196 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1713 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S3682 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback