NJ A5190 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Attorney General to conduct study on motor vehicle theft.
Title
Requires Attorney General to conduct study on motor vehicle theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |