NJ A5177 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by S3595 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Changes certain deadlines for primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes certain deadlines for primary election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27AssemblySubstituted by S3595 (1R)
2023-02-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-02-16AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-02-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3595 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Approved P.L.2023, c.16.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback