NJ A5159 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county commissioner of registration and board of elections to use electronic poll books.
Title
Permits county commissioner of registration and board of elections to use electronic poll books.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3544 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.80. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3544 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3544 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5159 (1R)