NJ A5149 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3234 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows deduction from tax of certain expenses when taxpayer's federal paycheck protection program loan is forgiven and excludes those forgiven loans from gross income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows deduction from tax of certain expenses when taxpayer's federal paycheck protection program loan is forgiven and excludes those forgiven loans from gross income tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted by S3234 (2R)
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3234 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.90.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback