NJ A5139 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eases certain food and beverage establishment tent requirements during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eases certain food and beverage establishment tent requirements during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2021-01-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3337 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback