NJ A5136 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes use of physical barriers as social distancing measure for food or beverage establishments during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Includes use of physical barriers as social distancing measure for food or beverage establishments during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3365 (Same As) 2021-01-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee