NJ A5135 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows continued use of heaters and tents by food or beverage establishments under certain circumstances during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows continued use of heaters and tents by food or beverage establishments under certain circumstances during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2021-01-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3316 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback