NJ A5133 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands indoor capacity for food or beverage establishments and banquet and wedding venues under certain circumstances during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands indoor capacity for food or beverage establishments and banquet and wedding venues under certain circumstances during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-03-17AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-01-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3374 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback