NJ A5130 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Foreclosure Prevention Act."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Foreclosure Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.34. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Substituted for S3244 (1R) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (60-15-0) |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-04 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3244 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A5130 (1R)