NJ A5119 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for reorganization of health service corporation.
Title
Provides for reorganization of health service corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3218 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.145. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-16) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (22-16) (Weinberg) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Oroho) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3218 (1R) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-24-1) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Motion To Table (51-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Munoz) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3218 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A5119 (1R)