NJ A5113 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $11,777,499 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $11,777,499 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.12.
2021-01-11SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2021-01-11SenateSubstituted for S3235
2021-01-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-01-11AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3235 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A5113

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback