NJ A5098 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes $18 hourly Medicaid reimbursement rate for personal care services.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes $18 hourly Medicaid reimbursement rate for personal care services.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3491 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-05SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-1-4)
2019-11-25Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2019-11-25AssemblyMotion Suspend 22:4a (73-0-1)(PintorMarin)
2019-08-23AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S3491 (1R)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-7-1)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-06-06AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3491 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5098 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback