NJ A5089 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program expires five years after each participating county has collected fee and that participating counties in program are not liable for fee imposed on hospitals.
Title
Clarifies that County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program expires five years after each participating county has collected fee and that participating counties in program are not liable for fee imposed on hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S3252 (1R) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3252 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Approved P.L.2021, c.41.