NJ A5059 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to establish certain nursing education and professional advancement programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to establish certain nursing education and professional advancement programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3031 (Same As) 2021-01-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback