NJ A5028 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.496.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "James Nicholas Rentas's Law," revises "New Jersey Smoke-Free Air Act."
Title
Establishes "James Nicholas Rentas's Law," revises "New Jersey Smoke-Free Air Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3523 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.496. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-2) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3523 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-6-1) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3523 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5028