NJ A5018 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3072 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted by S3072 (2R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3072 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback