NJ A5003 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S3411
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3411 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3411 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires receivership appointment application prior to certain foreclosure actions; requires notice of intention to foreclosure on residential mortgage to be filed within 180 days prior to commencing foreclosure; limits reinstatements of dismissed mortgage foreclosure actions.*
Title
Requires receivership appointment application prior to certain foreclosure actions; requires notice of intention to foreclosure on residential mortgage to be filed within 180 days prior to commencing foreclosure; limits reinstatements of dismissed mortgage foreclosure actions.*
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3411 (2R) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3411 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.69.
S3411 (Replaced by) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.69.
S3411 (Replaced by) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.69.